IL HR0394 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 18-6)
Status: Passed on June 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-01 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 18-6)
Status: Passed on June 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-01 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urges all four caucuses and the Governor to consider the Kaskaskia Watershed Comprehensive Plan when creating the upcoming fiscal year budget.
Title
KASKASKIA WATERSHED PLAN
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-01 | House | Resolution Adopted |
2019-05-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy Grant |
2019-05-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli |
2019-05-23 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2019-05-23 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Appropriations-Capital Committee; 018-000-000 |
2019-05-23 | House | Motion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed |
2019-05-23 | House | Motion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Appropriations-Capital Committee; Rep. Gregory Harris |
2019-05-23 | House | Assigned to Appropriations-Capital Committee |
2019-05-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Ugaste |
2019-05-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Butler |
2019-05-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsay Parkhurst |
2019-05-21 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Blaine Wilhour |
2019-05-21 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Chris Miller |
2019-05-21 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Nathan D. Reitz |
2019-05-21 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2019-05-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas M. Bennett |
2019-05-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael T. Marron |
2019-05-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Darren Bailey |
2019-05-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Avery Bourne |
2019-05-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson |
2019-05-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2019-05-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven Reick |
2019-05-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin |
2019-05-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant |
2019-05-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brad Halbrook |
2019-05-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2019-05-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2019-05-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Caulkins |
2019-05-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr. |
2019-05-21 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-05-20 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Charles Meier |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=394&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HR/10100HR0394.htm |