IL HR0422 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-07-02 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-07-02 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Directs the Auditor General to conduct a performance audit of the Department of Children and Family Services to review and assess the Department's ability to meet the placement needs of the children in its custody and compliance with its obligations to place children in its care in placements consistent with their best interests, and to make recommendations regarding how the Department can develop a responsive behavioral health continuum of care process that produces good outcomes for children and families in Illinois.
Title
AUDIT-DCFS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-02 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-05-30 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2019-05-30 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Adoption & Child Welfare Committee; 009-000-000 |
2019-05-29 | House | Motion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed |
2019-05-29 | House | Motion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Adoption & Child Welfare Committee; Rep. Gregory Harris |
2019-05-29 | House | Assigned to Adoption & Child Welfare Committee |
2019-05-28 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-05-27 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Sara Feigenholtz |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=422&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HR/10100HR0422.htm |