IL HR0635 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Declares November 2020 as "Family Caregivers Month".
Title
FAMILY CAREGIVERS MONTH
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-02-27 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2020-02-26 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Human Services Committee; 016-000-000 |
2020-02-18 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2020-01-28 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-12-17 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=635&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HR/10100HR0635.htm |