IL HR0644 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 13-5)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Declares April 2020 as Ambucs Appreciation Month in the State of Illinois.
Title
AMBUCS APPRECIATION MONTH
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-03-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David A. Welter |
2020-03-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli |
2020-03-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Brady |
2020-03-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael D. Unes |
2020-03-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Caulkins |
2020-03-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello |
2020-03-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lance Yednock |
2020-03-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer |
2020-03-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2020-03-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jeff Keicher |
2020-03-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Demmer |
2020-03-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2020-03-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II |
2020-03-04 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Darren Bailey |
2020-03-04 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael T. Marron |
2020-03-04 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. C.D. Davidsmeyer |
2020-03-04 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Butler |
2020-03-04 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2020-03-04 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Human Services Committee; 012-000-000 |
2020-02-25 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2020-01-28 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-01-06 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Mike Murphy |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=644&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HR/10100HR0644.htm |