IL HR0675 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-25 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-25 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Mourns the passing of former Illinois State Representative John C. "Jack" McGuire.
Title
MEMORIAL-IL. REP. JACK MCGUIRE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-25 | House | Resolution Adopted |
2020-01-28 | House | Placed on Calendar Agreed Resolutions |
2020-01-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr. |
2020-01-23 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=675&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HR/10100HR0675.htm |