IL HR0681 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urges Illinois to continue to be a leader in the protection of the privacy of its citizens by codifying the Illinois Constitution's fundamental right of privacy. Declares January 28, 2020 as "Data Privacy Day" in the State of Illinois.
Title
DATA PRIVACY DAY
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-02-25 | House | Assigned to Cybersecurity, Data Analytics, & IT Committee |
2020-01-29 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-01-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2020-01-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz |
2020-01-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Diane Pappas |
2020-01-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2020-01-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard |
2020-01-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsey LaPointe |
2020-01-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deanne M. Mazzochi |
2020-01-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris |
2020-01-28 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech |
2020-01-28 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2020-01-28 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2020-01-28 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kambium Buckner |
2020-01-28 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Ann M. Williams |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=681&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HR/10100HR0681.htm |