IL HR0692 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-06 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan "Yoni" Pizer
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-06 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan "Yoni" Pizer
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Recognizes that continuing to enforce a Eurocentric image of professionalism disparately impacts Black individuals and excludes them from some schools and workplaces in direct opposition to the United States' Constitutional values of equity and opportunity for all and is a form of racial discrimination. Encourages state policymakers to introduce legislation that prohibits discrimination against traits historically associated with race, including, but not limited to, natural hair textures and protective hairstyles.
Title
WORKPLACE DIVERSITY-EMBRACE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan "Yoni" Pizer |
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-02-25 | House | Assigned to Labor & Commerce Committee |
2020-02-04 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-01-29 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Carol Ammons |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=692&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HR/10100HR0692.htm |