IL HR0700 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Declares a "Children's Outdoor Bill of Rights".
Title
CHILDREN'S OUTDOOR RIGHTS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-03-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie |
2020-03-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2020-03-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason |
2020-03-04 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-03-04 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2020-03-04 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2020-03-04 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 021-000-000 |
2020-02-25 | House | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee |
2020-02-04 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-01-30 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Sonya M. Harper |