IL HR0745 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Illinois Technology First Council to study ways to expand the use of supportive technology for Illinoisans with developmental disabilities.
Title
TECHNOLOGY FIRST COUNCIL
Sponsors
Rep. Lindsey LaPointe [D] | Rep. Mary Flowers [D] | Rep. Michelle Mussman [D] | Sen. Michael Halpin [D] |
Rep. Monica Bristow [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Monica Bristow |
2020-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin |
2020-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2020-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2020-02-25 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2020-02-18 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-02-11 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Lindsey LaPointe |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=745&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HR/10100HR0745.htm |