IL HR0751 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Expresses support for a strong intercity passenger rail network and supports the passage of U.S. S.2922, the proposed "Rail Passenger Fairness Act", providing Amtrak the ability to enforce its preference rights by bringing a civil action before a federal district court.
Title
AMTRAK-PRIVATE RIGHT OF ACTION
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-03-05 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2020-03-04 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2020-03-03 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee; 010-002-000 |
2020-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2020-02-25 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee |
2020-02-18 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-02-13 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael Halpin |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=751&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HR/10100HR0751.htm |