IL HR0781 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 24 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urges the City of Chicago Council to hold a public hearing concerning the DFSS RFP process that resulted in the defunding of birth-to-five classrooms and staff.
Title
URGES HEARING PRE-K DECREASE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-03-17 | House | Assigned to Appropriations-Elementary & Secondary Education Committee |
2020-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2020-02-27 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2020-02-25 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-02-24 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. André Thapedi |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=781&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HR/10100HR0781.htm |