IL HR0860 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 20-0)
Status: Introduced on May 29 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-01-08 - Referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 29 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-01-08 - Referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Directs the Auditor General to conduct an audit of the Illinois Department of Employment Security and the unemployment benefits application system.
Title
IDES-UNEMPLOYMENT-AUDIT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-08 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-12-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. C.D. Davidsmeyer |
2020-12-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Murphy |
2020-09-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Butler |
2020-06-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas Morrison |
2020-06-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Avery Bourne |
2020-06-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli |
2020-06-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed |
2020-06-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deanne M. Mazzochi |
2020-06-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy Grant |
2020-06-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Brady |
2020-06-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brad Halbrook |
2020-06-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Chris Miller |
2020-06-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie |
2020-06-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas M. Bennett |
2020-05-29 | House | Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Weber |
2020-05-29 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Bradley Stephens |
2020-05-29 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven Reick |
2020-05-29 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles Meier |
2020-05-29 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael T. Marron |
2020-05-29 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Terri Bryant |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=860&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HR/10100HR0860.htm |