IL HR0861 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 43-13)
Status: Introduced on June 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-11-10 - Referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-11-10 - Referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urges the Illinois General Assembly and the United States Congress to explore a new, domestic investment plan to promote economic growth and recovery in targeted African American communities.
Title
ECONOMIC VITALITY PLAN
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-10 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-07-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Murphy |
2020-06-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz |
2020-06-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2020-06-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason |
2020-06-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller |
2020-06-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2020-06-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Diane Pappas |
2020-06-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Curtis J. Tarver, II |
2020-06-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2020-06-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark L. Walker |
2020-06-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez |
2020-06-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter |
2020-06-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Edly-Allen |
2020-06-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke |
2020-06-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jeff Keicher |
2020-06-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2020-06-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deanne M. Mazzochi |
2020-06-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie |
2020-06-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant |
2020-06-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Avery Bourne |
2020-06-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John Connor |
2020-06-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsay Parkhurst |
2020-06-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy Grant |
2020-06-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2020-06-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed |
2020-06-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Karina Villa |
2020-06-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
2020-06-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2020-06-09 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Edgar Gonzalez, Jr. |
2020-06-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2020-06-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin |
2020-06-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones |
2020-06-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2020-06-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith R. Wheeler |
2020-06-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2020-06-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Brady |
2020-06-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2020-06-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner |
2020-06-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Delia C. Ramirez |
2020-06-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K. Smith |
2020-06-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2020-06-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lamont J. Robinson, Jr. |
2020-06-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray |
2020-06-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II |
2020-06-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2020-06-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2020-06-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris |
2020-06-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis |
2020-06-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. André Thapedi |
2020-06-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2020-06-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2020-06-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2020-06-05 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Butler |
2020-06-05 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2020-06-05 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kambium Buckner |
2020-06-05 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=861&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HR/10100HR0861.htm |