IL HR0913 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on September 28 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-01-08 - Referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on September 28 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-01-08 - Referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Supports the normalization of relations between Israel and the United Arab Emirates and Bahrain. Calls on other Arab and Muslim countries to establish relations with Israel. Supports a negotiated solution to the Israeli-Palestinian conflict.
Title
SUPPORTS-ISRAEL/UAE RELATIONS
Sponsors
Rep. Jonathan Carroll [D] | Rep. Jonathan Pizer [D] | Rep. Sam Yingling [D] | Rep. Daniel Didech [D] |
Rep. Yehiel Kalish [D] | Rep. Bob Morgan [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-08 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-10-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Bob Morgan |
2020-10-06 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech |
2020-10-06 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling |
2020-10-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Yehiel M. Kalish |
2020-10-01 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan "Yoni" Pizer |
2020-09-28 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=913&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HR/10100HR0913.htm |