IL SB0010 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-4)
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-24 - Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the School Code. Provides that in fixing the salaries of teachers, a school board shall pay those who serve on a full-time basis a rate not less than (i) $32,076 for the 2020-2021 school year, (ii) $34,576 for the 2021-2022 school year, (iii) $37,076 for the 2022-2023 school year, and (iv) $40,000 for the 2023-2024 school year. Provides that the minimum salary rate for each school year thereafter, subject to review by the General Assembly, shall equal the minimum salary rate for the previous school year increased by a percentage equal to the percentage increase, if any, in the Consumer Price Index For All Urban Consumers for all items published by the United States Department of Labor for the previous school year.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SCH CD-MINIMUM TEACHER SALARY

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-11 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 45 N: 11 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-24HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2019
2019-05-14HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2019-05-14HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2019-05-09HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2019-05-08HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter School; 005-002-000
2019-05-07HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter
2019-04-30HouseAssigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter School
2019-04-11HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-04-11HouseFirst Reading
2019-04-11HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
2019-04-11HouseArrived in House
2019-04-11SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. John F. Curran
2019-04-11SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson
2019-04-11SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sue Rezin
2019-04-11SenateThird Reading - Passed; 045-011-000
2019-04-11SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2019-04-11SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Manar
2019-04-11SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2019-04-11SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III
2019-04-09SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Education; 012-002-000
2019-04-09SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2019-04-09SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Education
2019-04-05SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2019-04-05SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Andy Manar
2019-03-25SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2019-03-05SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 6, 2019
2019-03-05SenateSecond Reading
2019-03-04SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant
2019-02-07SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
2019-02-06SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam
2019-02-06SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 7, 2019
2019-02-06SenateDo Pass Education; 014-003-000
2019-02-05SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino
2019-02-05SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale Fowler
2019-02-01SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachelle Crowe
2019-01-23SenateAssigned to Education
2019-01-18SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
2019-01-18SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes
2019-01-11SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings
2019-01-09SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-01-09SenateFirst Reading
2019-01-09SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Andy Manar

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
105524-8Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback