IL SB0024 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriates $2 from the General Revenue Fund to the Department of Commerce and Economic Opportunity for its FY11 ordinary and contingent expenses. Effective July 1, 2011.
Title
$DCEO
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-08 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2013-01-03 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Appropriations II |
2013-01-02 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Appropriations II |
2013-01-02 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2013-01-02 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Heather A. Steans |
2013-01-02 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As January 8, 2013 |
2013-01-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading January 3, 2013 |
2013-01-02 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2012-01-14 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2011-11-29 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Dan Kotowski |
2011-11-29 | Senate | Sponsor Removed Sen. John M. Sullivan |
2011-11-28 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As December 31, 2011 |
2011-10-24 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As November 10, 2011 |
2011-10-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading October 25, 2011 |
2011-10-12 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2011-07-23 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2011-02-17 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 1, 2011 |
2011-02-17 | Senate | Second Reading |
2011-02-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 17, 2011 |
2011-02-16 | Senate | Do Pass Appropriations I; 006-004-000 |
2011-02-09 | Senate | Assigned to Appropriations I |
2011-02-09 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Heather A. Steans |
2011-01-27 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2011-01-27 | Senate | First Reading |
2011-01-27 | Senate | Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. John M. Sullivan |
2011-01-27 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Donne E. Trotter |