IL SB0024 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 37-0)
Status: Passed on August 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0294
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 37-0)
Status: Passed on August 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0294
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Provides that no rail carrier shall operate a train or light engine used in connection with the movement of freight unless it has an operating crew consisting of at least 2 individuals. Provides that the minimum freight train crew size shall remain in effect until a federal law or rule encompassing the subject matter has been adopted. Grants the Illinois Commerce Commission the power to conduct evidentiary hearings, make findings, and issue and enforce orders, including sanctions, with respect to freight train crew member size. Provides that "train or light engine" does not include trains operated by a hostler service or utility employees.
Title
VEH CD-FREIGHT TRAIN CREW SIZE
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-21 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 77 N: 36 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 35 N: 19 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 35 N: 19 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-09 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0294 |
2019-08-09 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2020 |
2019-08-09 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2019-06-19 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2019-05-21 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2019-05-21 | House | Third Reading - Standard Debate - Passed 077-036-001 |
2019-05-21 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Standard Debate |
2019-05-21 | House | Removed from Short Debate Status |
2019-05-21 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Bob Morgan |
2019-05-16 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Diane Pappas |
2019-05-16 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-16 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-15 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin |
2019-05-15 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2019-05-14 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2019-05-13 | House | Fiscal Note Filed |
2019-05-09 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. André Thapedi |
2019-05-09 | House | Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Margo McDermed |
2019-05-08 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez |
2019-05-08 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-07 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee; 009-004-000 |
2019-05-03 | House | Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Curtis J. Tarver, II |
2019-05-03 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Curtis J. Tarver, II |
2019-05-02 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2019-05-01 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones |
2019-04-30 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin |
2019-04-30 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee |
2019-04-11 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-11 | House | First Reading |
2019-04-11 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2019-04-11 | House | Arrived in House |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 035-019-000 |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 28, 2019 |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 21, 2019 |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 012-005-001 |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Steven M. Landek |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Postponed - Executive |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Christopher Belt |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Waive Posting Notice |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Re-assigned to Executive |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Re-referred to Assignments |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Postponed - Transportation |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Pat McGuire |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Assigned to Transportation |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachelle Crowe |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Andy Manar |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Scott M. Bennett |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam |
2019-01-09 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-01-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-01-09 | Senate | Prefiled with Secretary by Sen. Terry Link |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
625 | 5 | 18c-7402 | Amended Code | Citation Text |