IL SB0027 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-3)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-3)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Insurance Code. In provisions concerning coverage for telehealth services, provides that certain health benefit policies or plans may not exclude from coverage a medically necessary health care service or procedure delivered by certain providers solely because the health care service or procedure is provided through telehealth (rather than requiring certain policies to meet specified criteria if they provide coverage for telehealth services). Provides the requirements of coverage for telehealth services. Provides that an individual or group policy of accident or health insurance that provides coverage for telehealth services delivered by contracted licensed dietitian nutritionists and contracted certified diabetes educators must also provide coverage for in-home services for senior diabetes patients (rather than requiring an individual or group policy of accident or health insurance that provides coverage for telehealth services to provide coverage for licensed dietitian nutritionists and certified diabetes educators who counsel senior diabetes patients in the patients' homes). Amends the Illinois Public Aid Code. Provides payment, reimbursement, and service requirements for telehealth services provided under the State's fee-for-service or managed care medical assistance programs. Provides that "telehealth" includes telepsychiatry. Provides that the Department of Healthcare and Family Services shall implement the new provisions 60 days after the effective date of the amendatory Act. Repeals a provision requiring the Department to reimburse psychiatrists and federally qualified health centers for mental health services provided by psychiatrists to medical assistance recipients through telepsychiatry. Makes other changes.
Title
INS CODE/PUBLIC AID-TELEHEALTH
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Steven M. Landek |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As March 28, 2019 |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Postponed - Insurance |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Paul Schimpf |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Terry Link |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachelle Crowe |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Dave Syverson |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale Fowler |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Assigned to Insurance |
2019-01-10 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-01-10 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-01-10 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Andy Manar |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
215 | 5 | 356z.22 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
305 | 5 | 5-5.25 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
305 | 5 | 5-5.25a | New Code | See Bill Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=27&GAID=15&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB0027.htm |