IL SB0039 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 35-0)
Status: Passed on July 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-12 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0077
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 35-0)
Status: Passed on July 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-12 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0077
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the State Finance Act. Creates the Illinois Property Tax Relief Fund. Provides that moneys in the Illinois Property Tax Relief Fund shall be used to pay rebates to residential property taxpayers in the State. Provides that the Fund may accept moneys from any lawful source. Provides that the State Comptroller shall calculate a property tax rebate amount for the applicable property tax year by dividing the total amount appropriated from the Illinois Property Tax Relief Fund by the total number of homestead exemptions granted for homestead property in the State. Provides that the property tax bills of non-delinquent taxpayers who received a general homestead exemption under the Property Tax Code shall be reduced by the property tax rebate amount. Effective immediately.
Title
PROP TX-POLICE AND FIRE
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 96 N: 18 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 96 N: 18 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-12 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0077 |
2019-07-12 | Senate | Effective Date July 12, 2019 |
2019-07-12 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2019-06-05 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Senate Concurs |
2019-05-31 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Senate Concurs 056-000-001 |
2019-05-31 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Be Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2019-05-31 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2019-05-31 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Terry Link |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Terry Link |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 2 - May 31, 2019 |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 2 |
2019-05-30 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. André Thapedi |
2019-05-30 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2019-05-30 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2019-05-30 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz |
2019-05-30 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller |
2019-05-30 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2019-05-30 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 096-018-001 |
2019-05-30 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2019-05-30 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2019-05-30 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-30 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2019-05-29 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Diane Pappas |
2019-05-29 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard |
2019-05-29 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark L. Walker |
2019-05-29 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Nathan D. Reitz |
2019-05-29 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Monica Bristow |
2019-05-29 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer |
2019-05-29 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter |
2019-05-29 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray |
2019-05-28 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-28 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-28 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2019-05-28 | House | Alternate Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2019-05-28 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2019-05-28 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-05-28 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Daniel Didech |
2019-05-28 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-28 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2019-05-28 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Revenue & Finance Committee; 009-006-000 |
2019-05-28 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II |
2019-05-28 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2019-05-28 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. John Connor |
2019-05-28 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling |
2019-05-28 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason |
2019-05-28 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2019-05-28 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Edly-Allen |
2019-05-28 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Bob Morgan |
2019-05-28 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2019-05-28 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2019-05-28 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-05-28 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Daniel Didech |
2019-05-28 | House | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Daniel Didech |
2019-05-24 | House | Motion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed |
2019-05-24 | House | Motion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Revenue & Finance Committee; Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2019-05-24 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2019 |
2019-05-24 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2019-05-23 | House | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2019-05-10 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-05-09 | House | To Property Tax Subcommittee |
2019-04-09 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2019-03-22 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2019-03-21 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-21 | House | First Reading |
2019-03-20 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick |
2019-03-20 | House | Arrived in House |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000 |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 12, 2019 |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 018-000-000 |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Postponed - Executive |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Postponed - Executive |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachelle Crowe |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Postponed - Executive |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2019-01-10 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-01-10 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-01-10 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. John G. Mulroe |