IL SB0054 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-28 - House Committee Amendment No. 3 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Liquor Control Act of 1934. Creates a third-party facilitator license. Establishes licensing fees, recordkeeping requirements, reporting requirements, and other requirements for a third-party facilitator licensee. Provides that a retailer may deliver alcoholic liquors to the home or other designated location of a consumer in this State if specified conditions are met, including verifying that the individual accepting the delivery is at least 21 years of age. Provides that a retailer may use the services of a third-party facilitator by means of the Internet or mobile application to facilitate the sale of alcoholic liquors to be delivered to the home or other designated location of a consumer in this State if specified conditions are met, including verifying that the individual accepting the delivery is at least 21 years of age. Provides that the Illinois Liquor Control Commission may not treat a violation of those conditions as a violation by the retailer. Preempts home rule powers. Makes conforming changes. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

LIQUOR-HOME DELIVERY

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-11 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-28HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 3 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2019-06-28HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2019-05-31HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) June 30, 2019
2019-05-21HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2019-05-21HouseMotion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed
2019-05-21HouseMotion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Executive Committee; Rep. Natalie A. Manley
2019-05-20HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 3 Rules Refers to Executive Committee
2019-05-20HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee
2019-05-20HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
2019-05-20HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2019
2019-05-20HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2019-05-10HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2019-05-10HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2019-05-10HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2019-05-07HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Executive Committee
2019-05-07HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive Committee
2019-05-01HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2019-05-01HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
2019-04-30HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2019-04-30HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
2019-04-30HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2019-04-16HouseAlternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
2019-04-12HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Joe Sosnowski
2019-04-11HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-04-11HouseFirst Reading
2019-04-11HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski
2019-04-11HouseArrived in House
2019-04-11SenateThird Reading - Passed; 053-000-000
2019-04-09SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 10, 2019
2019-04-09SenateSecond Reading
2019-03-13SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 14, 2019
2019-03-13SenateDo Pass Executive; 018-000-000
2019-02-07SenatePostponed - Executive
2019-02-04SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant
2019-01-31SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dan McConchie
2019-01-31SenatePostponed - Executive
2019-01-30SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes
2019-01-29SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Dave Syverson
2019-01-28SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
2019-01-24SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Donald P. DeWitte
2019-01-23SenateAssigned to Executive
2019-01-16SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-01-16SenateFirst Reading
2019-01-16SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
23553-12Amended CodeCitation Text
23555-1Amended CodeCitation Text
23555-3Amended CodeCitation Text
23556-18.5New CodeSee Bill Text
23556-29.5New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback