IL SB0058 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Repeals the Firearm Owners Identification Card Act. Amends various Acts to make conforming changes.
Title
FIREARM OWNERS ID ACT-REPEAL
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As March 28, 2019 |
2019-03-05 | Senate | To Subcommittee on Firearms |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jason Plummer |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale Fowler |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary |
2019-01-16 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-01-16 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-01-16 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Neil Anderson |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=58&GAID=15&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB0058.htm |