IL SB0062 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0296
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0296
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Recorder Division of the Counties Code. Modifies how a county recorder determines if a lien is an expired lien under a county's demand and referral program by providing that a lien is expired if a suit to enforce the lien has not been commenced or a counterclaim has not been filed by the lienholder within 2 years after the completion date of the contract as specified in the recorded mechanics lien. Provides that the 2-year period shall be increased to the extent that an automatic stay under specified provisions of the United States Bankruptcy Code stays a suit or counterclaim to foreclose the lien or, if a work completion date is not specified in the recorded lien, then the work completion date is the date of recording of the mechanics lien. Effective immediately.
Title
COUNTY RECORDER-EXPIRED LIENS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-09 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0296 |
2019-08-09 | Senate | Effective Date August 9, 2019 |
2019-08-09 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2019-06-26 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2019-05-28 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 115-000-000 |
2019-05-28 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-22 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-22 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-16 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-15 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 013-000-000 |
2019-05-14 | House | Motion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed |
2019-05-14 | House | Motion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Executive Committee; Rep. Gregory Harris |
2019-05-14 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2019 |
2019-05-14 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2019-05-10 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-09 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2019-03-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-14 | House | First Reading |
2019-03-13 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard |
2019-03-06 | House | Arrived in House |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000 |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading February 20, 2019 |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading January 31, 2019 |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Do Pass Judiciary; 009-000-000 |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary |
2019-01-16 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-01-16 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-01-16 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Cristina Castro |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
55 | 5 | 3-5010.8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |