IL SB0066 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Law Enforcement Gang Database Information Act. Provides that each law enforcement agency that maintains a gang database or has access to a shared gang database shall have a policy regarding those databases. Provides that the policy shall include, but not be limited to: (1) that personnel authorized to access a gang database or shared gang database are limited to sworn law enforcement personnel, non-sworn law enforcement support personnel, criminal justice entities, or non-criminal justice technical or maintenance personnel, including information technology and information security staff and contract employees, who have been subject to character or security clearance and who have received approved training; (2) any records contained in a gang database, shared gang database, gang-related information in a law enforcement agency case report, gang-related information in a law enforcement agency dispatch note, or gang-related information in a law enforcement agency dispatch system record shall not be disclosed for the following purposes: employment, education, licensing, or housing, except that law enforcement and criminal justice entities may use information contained in a gang database or shared gang database for employment purposes, and records contained in a gang database or shared gang database may be disclosed to comply with federal law, for national security or homeland security purposes, for military screening purposes, or for other appropriate law enforcement purpose; (3) security procedures; and (4) the review and purge process from gang databases and shared gang databases. Defines terms. Amends the Code of Criminal Procedure of 1963. Provides that in all criminal cases, evidence which indicates the mere presence that the person was or is on a gang database or a shared gang database is not admissible. Effective immediately.
Title
GANG DATABASE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As March 28, 2019 |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Assigned to Criminal Law |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-01-23 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=66&GAID=15&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB0066.htm |