IL SB0068 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-9)
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-15 - Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Celina Villanueva
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Income Tax Act. Provides for a credit against withholding taxes in an amount equal to 25% of the wages or salary paid by a private employer to an Illinois employee while the employee is on organ donation leave if the employer grants all of its employees the option of taking a paid leave of absence of at least 30 days for the purpose of serving as an organ donor or bone marrow donor. Provides that the credit may not exceed $20,833.33 for each employee who takes organ donation leave. Provides that such a leave of absence must be taken without loss of pay, vacation time, compensatory time, personal days, or sick time for at least the first 30 days of the leave of absence. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

INC TX-ORGAN DONATION

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-11 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-15HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Celina Villanueva
2019-05-13HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley
2019-05-10HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2019-05-09HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson
2019-05-09HouseTo Income Tax Subcommittee
2019-05-08HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith R. Wheeler
2019-05-07HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Ugaste
2019-05-07HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. David McSweeney
2019-05-06HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
2019-05-06HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
2019-05-02HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Andrew S. Chesney
2019-05-01HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca
2019-04-30HouseAssigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
2019-04-11HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-04-11HouseFirst Reading
2019-04-11HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy
2019-04-11HouseArrived in House
2019-04-11SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
2019-04-11SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
2019-04-11SenateThird Reading - Passed; 058-000-000
2019-04-11SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2019-04-11SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 4 Adopted; Morrison
2019-04-11SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2019-04-10SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 4 Recommend Do Adopt Revenue; 008-000-000
2019-04-04SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 9, 2019
2019-04-04SenateSecond Reading
2019-04-04SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 4 Assignments Refers to Revenue
2019-04-04SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Postponed - Revenue
2019-04-03SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 4 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-8(b-1), this amendment will remain in the Committee on Assignments.
2019-03-29SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 4 Referred to Assignments
2019-03-29SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 4 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Julie A. Morrison
2019-03-27SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Postponed - Revenue
2019-03-26SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2019-03-26SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Assignments Refers to Revenue
2019-03-25SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments
2019-03-25SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Julie A. Morrison
2019-03-22SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2019-03-20SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 21, 2019
2019-03-20SenateDo Pass as Amended Revenue; 006-000-000
2019-03-20SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted
2019-03-20SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Revenue
2019-03-20SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Revenue
2019-03-19SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2019-03-19SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Julie A. Morrison
2019-03-19SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Revenue
2019-03-18SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jason A. Barickman
2019-03-15SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. John F. Curran
2019-03-15SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2019-03-15SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine
2019-03-14SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon
2019-03-14SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Steven M. Landek
2019-03-14SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Paul Schimpf
2019-03-14SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2019-03-14SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2019-03-14SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Julie A. Morrison
2019-03-14SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III
2019-03-14SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sue Rezin
2019-03-13SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. John G. Mulroe
2019-03-12SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson
2019-02-07SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Christopher Belt
2019-02-07SenatePostponed - Revenue
2019-02-04SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler
2019-01-23SenateAssigned to Revenue
2019-01-23SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-01-23SenateFirst Reading
2019-01-23SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Julie A. Morrison

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
355704AAmended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback