IL SB0072 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-02 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0188
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-02 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0188
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Election Code. Provides that, if a vacancy in the office of President of the Cook County Board occurs on or after the first day for the filing of nomination papers, then nominations for the office of President of the Cook County Board are to be made by the county central committee of each established political party. Amends the Counties Code. Provides that, in the event of a vacancy in the office of president of the county board of commissioners, the members of the county board of commissioners shall elect one of their number to serve as president of the county board of commissioners until the next special or regular election for the office of president of the county board of commissioners. Provides that, if more than 28 months remain in the unexpired term, then a special election shall be held. Provides that, if 28 months or less remain in the unexpired term, the appointed president of the county board of commissioners shall serve until the next regular election. Effective immediately.
Title
COOK COUNTY BOARD PRES-VACANCY
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-21 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-02 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0188 |
2019-08-02 | Senate | Effective Date August 2, 2019 |
2019-08-02 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2019-06-19 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2019-05-21 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 113-003-000 |
2019-05-14 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-14 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-02 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-01 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 008-000-000 |
2019-04-09 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2019-03-28 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-28 | House | First Reading |
2019-03-28 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris |
2019-03-28 | House | Arrived in House |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 050-000-000 |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading February 20, 2019 |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 5, 2019 |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 016-000-000 |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-01-23 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
10 | 5 | 7-11.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
55 | 5 | 2-6003 | Amended Code | Citation Text |