IL SB0075 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 35-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-24 - Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Creates the Hotel and Casino Employee Safety Act. Requires hotels and casinos to adopt anti-sexual harassment policies and make panic buttons available to certain employees. Prohibits retaliation against an employee for using a panic button, availing himself or herself of the protections afforded by an anti-sexual harassment policy, or disclosing, reporting, or testifying about violations of the Act. Provides remedies for noncompliance. Limits home rule powers. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

HOTEL CASINO EMPLOYEE SAFETY

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-11 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 51 N: 3 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-24HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2019
2019-05-14HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2019-05-14HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2019-05-14HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Karina Villa
2019-05-14HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2019-05-14HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Celina Villanueva
2019-05-14HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez
2019-05-09HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2019-05-08HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Labor & Commerce Committee; 024-000-000
2019-05-08HouseAlternate Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
2019-05-08HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
2019-04-30HouseAssigned to Labor & Commerce Committee
2019-04-29HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke
2019-04-11HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-04-11HouseFirst Reading
2019-04-11HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Bob Morgan
2019-04-11HouseArrived in House
2019-04-11SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler
2019-04-11SenateThird Reading - Passed; 051-003-000
2019-04-11SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2019-04-11SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Villivalam
2019-04-11SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2019-04-10SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Labor; 012-000-000
2019-04-04SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 9, 2019
2019-04-04SenateSecond Reading
2019-04-03SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Labor
2019-04-02SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2019-04-02SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ram Villivalam
2019-03-26SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings
2019-03-26SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III
2019-03-26SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson
2019-03-26SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham
2019-03-26SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Ellman
2019-03-21SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
2019-03-21SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachelle Crowe
2019-03-21SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon
2019-03-21SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2019-03-21SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. John G. Mulroe
2019-03-21SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison
2019-03-21SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2019-03-21SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Christopher Belt
2019-03-21SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine
2019-03-21SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton
2019-03-20SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters
2019-03-20SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 21, 2019
2019-03-20SenateDo Pass as Amended Labor; 012-000-000
2019-03-20SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2019-03-19SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Labor
2019-03-15SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2019-03-15SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ram Villivalam
2019-03-06SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
2019-02-20SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
2019-02-19SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz
2019-02-19SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2019-02-15SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2019-02-14SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans
2019-02-14SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
2019-02-14SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino
2019-02-05SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. John F. Curran
2019-02-05SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Ann Gillespie
2019-01-29SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush
2019-01-23SenateAssigned to Labor
2019-01-23SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-01-23SenateFirst Reading
2019-01-23SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Ram Villivalam

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback