IL SB0077 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-28 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Eviction Article of the Code of Civil Procedure. Provides that eviction proceedings shall be sealed and remain so unless a final order of eviction in favor of the plaintiff is entered. Provides that unsealed records shall remain unsealed for a period of 7 years. Provides that after 7 years, access to the court records may be obtained only by specified parties. Provides that if a case is filed by a board of managers of a condominium association and names or joins a tenant of a condominium unit to the proceedings, the tenant's name shall be permanently suppressed by order of the court. Effective 90 days after becoming law.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CIV PRO-EVICTION CASE SEALING

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-28SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2019-03-28SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2019-03-28SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2019-03-22SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As March 28, 2019
2019-03-20SenatePostponed - Judiciary
2019-03-19SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Postponed - Judiciary
2019-03-19SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Judiciary
2019-03-05SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Judiciary
2019-03-05SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Judiciary
2019-02-27SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2019-02-27SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
2019-02-26SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2019-02-26SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
2019-01-30SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters
2019-01-29SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2019-01-23SenateAssigned to Judiciary
2019-01-23SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-01-23SenateFirst Reading
2019-01-23SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Patricia Van Pelt

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
73559-102.5New CodeSee Bill Text
73559-104.2Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback