IL SB0083 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Department of Veterans' Affairs Act. Provides that the Veterans' Service-Related Ailments Task Force shall meet at least once every 2 months beginning January 1, 2020 (rather than beginning July 1, 2019). Effective immediately.
Title
OPEN MEETINGS-TRAINING
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-11-14 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2019-12-15 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2019-11-14 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2019-11-14 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Linda Holmes |
2019-11-14 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - November 14, 2019 |
2019-11-14 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 |
2019-11-14 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason |
2019-11-14 | House | Alternate Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin |
2019-11-14 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin |
2019-11-14 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 116-000-000 |
2019-11-14 | House | 3/5 Vote Required |
2019-11-14 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-11-14 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2019-11-14 | House | Recalled to Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-11-13 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Veterans' Affairs Committee; 016-000-000 |
2019-11-13 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Veterans' Affairs Committee |
2019-11-13 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-11-13 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2019-11-13 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-11-13 | House | Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2019-06-28 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-05-31 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) June 30, 2019 |
2019-05-24 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2019 |
2019-05-21 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2019-05-21 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2019-05-21 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin |
2019-05-21 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Diane Pappas |
2019-05-21 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca |
2019-05-14 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-14 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-02 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-04-30 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Cities & Villages Committee; 011-000-000 |
2019-04-09 | House | Assigned to Cities & Villages Committee |
2019-03-21 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-21 | House | First Reading |
2019-03-20 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2019-03-20 | House | Arrived in House |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000 |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading February 20, 2019 |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 7, 2019 |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Do Pass Local Government; 008-000-000 |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Assigned to Local Government |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-01-23 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Linda Holmes |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
5 | 120 | 1.05 | Amended Code | Citation Text |