IL SB0085 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-03-13 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-03-13 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Firearm Liability Act. Provides that a firearm transferor is strictly liable in a civil action for death, injury, or property damage resulting from the use of a firearm that was unlawfully sold, transferred, or caused to be sold or transferred. Provides that the plaintiff may recover punitive damages in addition to all other lawful damages, court costs, and attorney's fees. Provides that a defendant found strictly liable under this Act must pay $10,000 in a civil penalty to the Department of State Police if the defendant sold, transferred, or caused to be sold or transferred a firearm in violation of certain provisions of the Firearm Owners Identification Card Act or the Criminal Code of 1961. Provides that an action under this Act must be commenced within 5 years after the cause of action accrued.
Title
FIREARM LIABILITY ACT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-03-13 | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments | |
2009-03-11 | Held in Judiciary | |
2009-03-05 | Held in Judiciary | |
2009-03-04 | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins | |
2009-02-25 | Postponed - Judiciary | |
2009-02-19 | Postponed - Judiciary | |
2009-02-10 | Postponed - Judiciary | |
2009-02-04 | Assigned to Judiciary | |
2009-01-30 | Referred to Assignments | |
2009-01-30 | First Reading | |
2009-01-30 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ira I. Silverstein |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=85&GAID=10&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=76&GA=96 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/96/SB/09600SB0085.htm |