IL SB0089 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Criminal Code of 2012 concerning firearm safety devices. Provides that any firearm sold or transferred in the State by a federally licensed firearms dealer or a private seller, including a private transfer through a firearms dealer, shall at the time of the sale or transfer of the firearm include or be accompanied by a firearm safety device. Provides that the Department of State Police shall adopt rules setting forth specific firearm safety devices or the minimum standards to constitute an effective firearm safety device. Defines "firearm safety device" as an integrated design feature or an attachable accessory that is resistant to tampering and is effective in preventing the discharge of a firearm by a person who does not have access to the key, combination, or other safety mechanism used to disengage the device, but does not include the firearm safety, safety catch, or any other safety system that prevents the accidental firing of a firearm. Provides exemptions. A violation of this provision is a Class C misdemeanor with a fine of not less than $1,000. A second or subsequent violation is a Class A misdemeanor.
Title
CRIM CD-FIREARM SAFETY DEVICES
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As March 28, 2019 |
2019-03-05 | Senate | To Subcommittee on Firearms |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-01-23 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
720 | 5 | 24-9.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=89&GAID=15&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB0089.htm |