IL SB0091 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Income Tax Act. Creates an income tax checkoff for donations to the Ronald McDonald House Charities Fund. Amends the State Finance Act to create the Fund. Provides that moneys deposited into the Fund shall be used to make grants to Ronald McDonald House Charities for services in Illinois. Effective immediately.
Title
INC TX-RONALD MCDONALD FUND
Sponsors
Sen. Chuck Weaver [R] | Sen. David Koehler [D] | Rep. Ryan Spain [R] | Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth [D] |
Rep. Camille Lilly [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-06 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2019-05-10 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-05-09 | House | To Income Tax Subcommittee |
2019-04-09 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2019-03-14 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2019-03-14 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth |
2019-03-06 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-06 | House | First Reading |
2019-03-06 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain |
2019-03-06 | House | Arrived in House |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000 |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading February 20, 2019 |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 19, 2019 |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Do Pass Revenue; 007-000-000 |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Assigned to Revenue |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-01-23 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Chuck Weaver |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 105 | 5.891 | New Code | See Bill Text |
30 | 105 | 6z-107 | New Code | See Bill Text |
35 | 5 | 507JJJ | New Code | See Bill Text |