IL SB0100 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on August 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-23 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0523
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on August 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-23 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0523
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Election Code. Requires that the trustees for the Fox Metro Water Reclamation District be elected at consolidated elections. Provides that where a nomination for election is to be made for a trustee of the Fox Metro Water Reclamation District, then the petition shall be filed in the office of the county clerk not more than 113 nor less than 106 days prior to the date of the primary. Amends the Sanitary District Act of 1917. Provides that the board of trustees of the Fox Metro Water Reclamation District shall be elected (rather than appointed) beginning with the 2019 election. Sets forth requirements concerning the number of trustees to be elected and length of terms. Effective immediately.
Title
FOX METRO WATER RECLAMATION
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-24 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 89 N: 24 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-24 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 89 N: 24 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-23 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0523 |
2019-08-23 | Senate | Effective Date August 23, 2019 |
2019-08-23 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2019-06-28 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Senate Concurs |
2019-05-31 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Senate Concurs 058-000-000 |
2019-05-31 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Senate Concurs 058-000-000 |
2019-05-31 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 058-000-000 |
2019-05-29 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Local Government; 006-000-000 |
2019-05-29 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Local Government; 006-000-000 |
2019-05-29 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Local Government; 006-000-000 |
2019-05-28 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Local Government |
2019-05-28 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Local Government |
2019-05-28 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Local Government |
2019-05-27 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2019-05-27 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Linda Holmes |
2019-05-27 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2019-05-27 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Linda Holmes |
2019-05-27 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2019-05-27 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Linda Holmes |
2019-05-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 2, 3 - May 28, 2019 |
2019-05-27 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 2, 3 |
2019-05-24 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 089-024-000 |
2019-05-21 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-21 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted |
2019-05-21 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-17 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Fred Crespo |
2019-05-16 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2019-05-14 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-05-14 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2019-05-08 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-07 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Cities & Villages Committee; 008-006-000 |
2019-05-07 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted in Cities & Villages Committee; by Voice Vote |
2019-05-07 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Cities & Villages Committee; by Voice Vote |
2019-05-07 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Cities & Villages Committee |
2019-05-07 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Cities & Villages Committee |
2019-05-06 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-05-06 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2019-05-02 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-05-02 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2019-04-09 | House | Assigned to Cities & Villages Committee |
2019-03-21 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-21 | House | First Reading |
2019-03-20 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2019-03-20 | House | Arrived in House |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 054-000-000 |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 7, 2019 |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Local Government; 009-000-000 |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Local Government |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Linda Holmes |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Postponed - Local Government |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Assigned to Local Government |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-01-23 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Linda Holmes |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
10 | 5 | 2A-41 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
10 | 5 | 7-12 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
70 | 2405 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |