IL SB0104 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Passed on August 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-23 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0524
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Procurement Code. Provides that the Capital Development Board and the Department of Transportation shall each, by rule, implement a pilot program under which select construction contracts shall contain provisions that if a subcontractor has performed in accordance with the provisions of the subcontract and the work has been accepted by the State agency, the State agency shall pay the subcontractor directly. Provides that the program shall be implemented by January 1, 2021. Amends the State Prompt Payment Act. Provides that certain provisions concerning payments to subcontractors do not apply to payments to a subcontractor for work performed under a subcontract entered into with a construction contractor if the contract contains a provision that the State agency shall pay the subcontractor directly.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PROMPT PAYMENT-CONTRACTORS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-30 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 38 N: 17 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 101 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 35 N: 17 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-08-23SenatePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0524
2019-08-23SenateEffective Date January 1, 2020
2019-08-23SenateGovernor Approved
2019-06-28SenateSent to the Governor
2019-05-30SenatePassed Both Houses
2019-05-30SenateSenate Concurs
2019-05-30SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 038-017-000
2019-05-30SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Transportation; 013-006-000
2019-05-29SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Transportation
2019-05-29SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
2019-05-29SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Ram Villivalam
2019-05-28SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 29, 2019
2019-05-28SenateSecretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1
2019-05-28HouseAlternate Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Lamont J. Robinson, Jr.
2019-05-28HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lamont J. Robinson, Jr.
2019-05-28HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 101-014-000
2019-05-28HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2019-05-28HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2019-05-27HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Fiscal Note Filed as Amended
2019-05-26HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Fiscal Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Tom Demmer
2019-05-26HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2019-05-24HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted State Government Administration Committee; 010-000-000
2019-05-23HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to State Government Administration Committee
2019-05-22HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2019-05-22HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
2019-05-22HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2019-05-22HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2019-05-22HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2019-05-16HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2019-05-15HouseDo Pass / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 007-003-000
2019-05-15HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2019-05-14HouseMotion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed
2019-05-14HouseMotion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 State Government Administration Committee; Rep. Gregory Harris
2019-05-14HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2019
2019-05-14HouseAssigned to State Government Administration Committee
2019-05-10HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2019-05-09HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
2019-05-09HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis
2019-05-09HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis
2019-05-09HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
2019-05-09HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter
2019-05-08HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
2019-05-08HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Lamont J. Robinson, Jr.
2019-05-07HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez
2019-05-07HouseAssigned to State Government Administration Committee
2019-05-02HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-05-02HouseFirst Reading
2019-05-01HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2019-05-01HouseArrived in House
2019-05-01SenateThird Reading - Passed; 035-017-000
2019-05-01SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2019-05-01SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted; Sandoval
2019-05-01SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Sandoval
2019-05-01SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2019-05-01SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2019-05-01SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Martin A. Sandoval
2019-04-12SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 2, 2019
2019-04-11SenateChief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Ram Villivalam
2019-04-11SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III
2019-04-09SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommend Do Adopt Transportation; 012-003-000
2019-04-09SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Transportation; 012-003-000
2019-04-09SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 10, 2019
2019-04-09SenateSecond Reading
2019-04-04SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Assignments Refers to Transportation
2019-04-04SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Postponed - Transportation
2019-04-03SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments
2019-04-03SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Martin A. Sandoval
2019-03-26SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Transportation
2019-03-25SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2019-03-25SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Martin A. Sandoval
2019-03-20SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 21, 2019
2019-03-20SenateDo Pass as Amended Transportation; 018-000-000
2019-03-19SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2019-03-14SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Transportation
2019-03-13SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2019-03-13SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Martin A. Sandoval
2019-03-12SenatePostponed - Transportation
2019-03-05SenatePostponed - Transportation
2019-02-20SenatePostponed - Transportation
2019-01-30SenateAssigned to Transportation
2019-01-23SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-01-23SenateFirst Reading
2019-01-23SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Martin A. Sandoval

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3050020-120Amended CodeCitation Text
305407Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=104&GAID=15&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=108&GA=101
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB0104.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB0104eng.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB0104enr.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/publicacts/101/101-0524.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB0104sam001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB0104sam002.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB0104sam003.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB0104ham001.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/101/senate/10100SB0104_05012019_009000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/101/house/10100SB0104_05282019_017000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/101/senate/10100SB0104ham001_05302019_018000C.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback