IL SB0109 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-1)
Status: Enrolled on May 21 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-06-19 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Authorized Electronic Monitoring in Long-Term Care Facilities Act. Includes in the definition of "facility" a facility that provides housing to individuals with dementia. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

FACILITY-ELECTRONIC MONITORING

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-21 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-19SenateSent to the Governor
2019-05-21SenatePassed Both Houses
2019-05-21HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 116-000-000
2019-05-14HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2019-05-14HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2019-05-09HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Edly-Allen
2019-05-02HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2019-05-01HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
2019-05-01HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Karina Villa
2019-05-01HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Monica Bristow
2019-05-01HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jeff Keicher
2019-05-01HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 014-000-000
2019-04-09HouseAssigned to Human Services Committee
2019-04-02HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-04-02HouseFirst Reading
2019-04-01SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson
2019-04-01HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech
2019-03-27SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2019-03-27HouseArrived in House
2019-03-27SenateThird Reading - Passed; 054-000-000
2019-03-19SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Christopher Belt
2019-03-19SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Ellman
2019-03-14SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison
2019-03-14SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
2019-03-13SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 14, 2019
2019-03-13SenateSecond Reading
2019-03-12SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 13, 2019
2019-03-12SenateDo Pass as Amended Public Health; 010-000-000
2019-03-12SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2019-03-08SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Suzy Glowiak
2019-03-06SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Public Health
2019-03-04SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2019-03-04SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Terry Link
2019-02-19SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. John G. Mulroe
2019-02-07SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine
2019-02-06SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Scott M. Bennett
2019-02-06SenatePostponed - Public Health
2019-02-04SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz
2019-01-30SenateAssigned to Public Health
2019-01-29SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2019-01-23SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-01-23SenateFirst Reading
2019-01-23SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Terry Link

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
210325Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback