IL SB0110 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-8)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-8)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Property Tax Code. Provides that, for the 2015 taxable year and thereafter, the exemption for veterans with disabilities also carries over to the surviving spouse of a veteran who was killed in the line of duty in the current taxable year or any preceding taxable year. Provides that, for the 2019 taxable year and thereafter, the exemption for veterans with disabilities also carries over to (i) the surviving spouse of a veteran who did not obtain the exemption before death, but who would have qualified for the exemption in the current taxable year if he or she had survived and (ii) the surviving spouse of a veteran whose death was determined to be service-connected and who is certified by the United States Department of Veterans Affairs as being a current recipient of Dependency and Indemnity Compensation. Provides that, in the case of a surviving spouse who is certified by the United States Department of Veterans Affairs as being a current recipient of Dependency and Indemnity Compensation, the property is exempt. Effective immediately.
Title
PROP TX-SURVIVING SPOUSE
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-06 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2020-09-30 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Melinda Bush |
2020-09-12 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Don Harmon |
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-03-09 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Christopher Belt |
2020-02-25 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Chapin Rose |
2020-02-25 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Lance Yednock |
2020-02-20 | House | To Property Tax Subcommittee |
2020-02-18 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Edly-Allen |
2020-02-11 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark L. Walker |
2020-02-06 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale Fowler |
2020-02-04 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2020-01-16 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Joe Sosnowski |
2019-10-04 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Karina Villa |
2019-05-10 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-05-09 | House | To Property Tax Subcommittee |
2019-05-02 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2019-05-01 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin |
2019-04-24 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Monica Bristow |
2019-04-19 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Donald P. DeWitte |
2019-04-09 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2019-04-03 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Suzy Glowiak Hilton |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachelle Crowe |
2019-03-06 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-06 | House | First Reading |
2019-03-06 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2019-03-06 | House | Arrived in House |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000 |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading February 20, 2019 |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. John G. Mulroe |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 19, 2019 |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Do Pass Revenue; 007-000-000 |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Scott M. Bennett |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Ellman |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Assigned to Revenue |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-01-23 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Terry Link |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 200 | 15-169 | Amended Code | Citation Text |