IL SB0111 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-2)
Status: Passed on August 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-23 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0525
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-2)
Status: Passed on August 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-23 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0525
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Insurance Code. In provisions concerning coverage for anesthetics provided in conjunction with dental care to an individual diagnosed with autism spectrum disorder, changes the age of the individual that treatment shall be covered to under age 26 (rather than under age 19).
Title
INS CODE-DENTAL ANESTHETICS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-30 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-24 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-24 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-23 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0525 |
2019-08-23 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2020 |
2019-08-23 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2019-06-28 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Senate Concurs |
2019-05-30 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 058-000-001 |
2019-05-30 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Insurance; 014-000-000 |
2019-05-28 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Insurance |
2019-05-28 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2019-05-28 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2019-05-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 28, 2019 |
2019-05-27 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 |
2019-05-24 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Diane Pappas |
2019-05-24 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 114-000-000 |
2019-05-20 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard |
2019-05-16 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Chris Miller |
2019-05-14 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-14 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2019-05-14 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-13 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer |
2019-05-13 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
2019-05-08 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2019-05-07 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2019-05-06 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-05-06 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2019-05-02 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-01 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2019-05-01 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2019-05-01 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca |
2019-05-01 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller |
2019-05-01 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Bob Morgan |
2019-05-01 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Brady |
2019-04-30 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Insurance Committee; 017-000-000 |
2019-04-18 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2019-04-09 | House | Assigned to Insurance Committee |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Steven M. Landek |
2019-03-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-14 | House | First Reading |
2019-03-14 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2019-03-14 | House | Arrived in House |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000 |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 12, 2019 |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Insurance; 016-000-000 |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Christopher Belt |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Insurance |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Scott M. Bennett |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ann Gillespie |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Assigned to Insurance |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-01-23 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
215 | 5 | 356z.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |