IL SB0112 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-10 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the General Assembly Compensation Act. Provides that any member of the General Assembly who is appointed to the House of Representatives or Senate after May 31 of an even-numbered year may not receive additional salary for service as a chairman or minority spokesman. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

GA MEMBER COMPENSATION

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-11 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-10HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2019-04-30HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2019-04-11HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-04-11HouseFirst Reading
2019-04-11HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray
2019-04-11SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Ellman
2019-04-11HouseArrived in House
2019-04-11SenateThird Reading - Passed; 058-000-000
2019-04-04SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2019-04-04SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Bertino-Tarrant
2019-04-04SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2019-04-04SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Executive; 013-000-000
2019-04-02SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson
2019-03-28SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III
2019-03-27SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive
2019-03-27SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2019-03-27SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant
2019-03-26SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 27, 2019
2019-03-26SenateSecond Reading
2019-03-21SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush
2019-03-20SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 21, 2019
2019-03-20SenateDo Pass Executive; 018-000-000
2019-03-19SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2019-03-12SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Ellman
2019-03-12SenateAssigned to Executive
2019-01-24SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton
2019-01-24SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Suzy Glowiak Hilton
2019-01-23SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-01-23SenateFirst Reading
2019-01-23SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
251151Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback