IL SB0117 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Passed on July 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-26 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0161
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Passed on July 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-26 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0161
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois School Student Records Act. Provides that if the rights and privileges accorded to a parent under the Act have been transferred to a student, a school must give reasonable prior notice to the student (rather than the parent) before any school student record is destroyed or any information is deleted from that record. Provides that a school may provide reasonable prior notice to a parent or student through (i) notice in the school's parent or student handbook, (ii) publication in a newspaper, (iii) U.S. mail delivered to the last known address of the parent or student, or (iv) other means provided the notice is confirmed to have been received.
Title
STUDENT RECORDS DESTRUCTION
Sponsors
Sen. Jason Barickman [R] | Sen. Chuck Weaver [R] | Sen. Thomas Bennett [R] | Rep. Dan Brady [R] |
Rep. Michelle Mussman [D] | Rep. Katie Stuart [D] | Rep. Tony McCombie [R] | Rep. Avery Bourne [R] |
Rep. Fred Crespo [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-21 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-26 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0161 |
2019-07-26 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2020 |
2019-07-26 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2019-06-19 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2019-05-21 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 115-000-000 |
2019-05-14 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-14 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-08 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Fred Crespo |
2019-05-08 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Avery Bourne |
2019-05-08 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie |
2019-05-08 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2019-05-07 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2019-05-02 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-01 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 019-000-000 |
2019-04-09 | House | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee |
2019-03-29 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Brady |
2019-03-27 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-27 | House | First Reading |
2019-03-27 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Thomas M. Bennett |
2019-03-27 | House | Arrived in House |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 053-000-000 |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 5, 2019 |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Chuck Weaver |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 7, 2019 |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Do Pass Education; 014-000-000 |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Assigned to Education |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-01-29 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jason A. Barickman |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 10 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |