IL SB0122 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Procurement Code. Requires the Department of Central Management Services to submit an annual report concerning certifications issued to veteran-owned small businesses and service-disabled veteran-owned small businesses. Requires the Department to conduct a minimum of 2 outreach events per year to ensure that veteran-owned small businesses and service-disabled veteran-owned small businesses know about the procurement opportunities and certification requirements with the State. Adds additional requirements concerning the certification program for veteran-owned small businesses and service-disabled veteran-owned small businesses. Provides that the Department of Central Management Services, in consultation with the Department of Veteran Affairs, may develop programs and agreements to encourage cities, counties, towns, townships, and other certifying entities to adopt uniform certification procedures and certification recognition programs. Provides that a business shall be certified by the Department of Central Management Services as a service-disabled veteran-owned small business or a veteran-owned small business if the Department determines that the business has been certified as a service-disabled veteran-owned small business or a veteran-owned small business by the Vets First Verification Program of the United States Department of Veterans Affairs, and the business has provided to the Department with specified information. Provides that the policies of the Department of Central Management Services regarding recognition of the Vets First Verification Program shall be reviewed annually. Effective immediately.
Title
PROCUREMENT-VETERAN PREFERENCE
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-11 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2019-05-10 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-30 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke |
2019-04-30 | House | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee |
2019-04-11 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-11 | House | First Reading |
2019-04-11 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin |
2019-04-11 | House | Arrived in House |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000 |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 9, 2019 |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Hastings |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Veterans Affairs; 006-000-000 |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Veterans Affairs |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 21, 2019 |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Do Pass Veterans Affairs; 009-000-000 |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachelle Crowe |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Assigned to Veterans Affairs |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-01-29 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 500 | 45-57 | Amended Code | Citation Text |