IL SB0124 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Property Tax Code. Provides that upon establishing the compensation of board of review employees fixed by the county board, the county shall, at all times, ensure that each of the commissioners on the board of review receives equitable resources and staffing. Effective immediately.
Title
PROP TX-BD OF REVIEW RESOURCES
Sponsors
Sen. Dan McConchie [R] | Sen. John Curran [R] | Sen. Steven Landek [D] | Sen. Bill Brady [R] |
Sen. Jim Oberweis [R] | Sen. William Cunningham [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As March 28, 2019 |
2019-03-13 | Senate | To Subcommittee on Local Policies |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Postponed - Local Government |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Postponed - Local Government |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jim Oberweis |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Steven M. Landek |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Postponed - Local Government |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. William E. Brady |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. John F. Curran |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Assigned to Local Government |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-01-29 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dan McConchie |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 200 | 5-15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=124&GAID=15&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB0124.htm |