IL SB0130 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Public Utilities Act. Provides that the Illinois Commerce Commission shall conduct at least one workshop and issue a report examining the ability of competitive energy markets to reduce total costs for Illinois consumers and encourage merchant investment through combinations of supply and demand-side management options. Provides that the Commission shall conduct at least one workshop and issue a report on the performance of all power generation in the State during the summer peak demand periods of 2018 and the winter peak demand period of 2018-2019, and identify which resources ensure the lowest cost and most reliable generation for Illinois consumers. Provides that the Commission shall conduct at least one workshop and issue a report that identifies the volumes, generation sources by fuel type, and market values of hourly electricity imports to and exports from Illinois for the years 2016, 2017, and 2018. Provides that the reports shall be submitted to the Governor and the General Assembly, as well as posted on the Internet website of the Commission, on or before March 1, 2020. Repeals the provisions on January 1, 2021. Effective immediately.
Title
ICC-WORKSHOPS AND REPORTS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 28, 2019 |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 26, 2019 |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Energy and Public Utilities; 013-000-000 |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Energy and Public Utilities |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Energy and Public Utilities |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. David Koehler |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Energy and Public Utilities |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. David Koehler |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Assigned to Energy and Public Utilities |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-01-29 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. David Koehler |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
220 | 5 | 1-101 | Amended Code | Citation Text |