IL SB0145 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Election Code. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning expenses of conducting a primary election.
Title
ELEC CD-PRESIDENT-TAX RETURNS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-11 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 36 N: 19 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2021-01-12 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Executive Committee; 008-005-000 |
2021-01-12 | House | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Katie Stuart |
2021-01-12 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Executive Committee |
2021-01-12 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-01-12 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Katie Stuart |
2021-01-08 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2021-01-08 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2021-01-08 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2021-01-08 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Executive Committee; 008-005-000 |
2021-01-08 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Executive Committee; by Voice Vote |
2021-01-08 | House | Alternate Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Gregory Harris |
2021-01-08 | House | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Gregory Harris |
2021-01-08 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive Committee |
2021-01-08 | House | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Katie Stuart |
2021-01-07 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-01-07 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Gregory Harris |
2021-01-02 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2019-05-10 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-05-07 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Edly-Allen |
2019-04-30 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2019-04-12 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2019-04-12 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2019-04-12 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2019-04-12 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz |
2019-04-12 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2019-04-12 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez |
2019-04-12 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2019-04-12 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams |
2019-04-12 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
2019-04-12 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kambium Buckner |
2019-04-12 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2019-04-12 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris |
2019-04-11 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-11 | House | First Reading |
2019-04-11 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Celina Villanueva |
2019-04-11 | House | Arrived in House |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 036-019-000 |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 28, 2019 |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 14, 2019 |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Executive; 013-004-000 |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Antonio Muñoz |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Scott M. Bennett |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Ellman |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-01-29 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Antonio Muñoz |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
10 | 5 | 21-1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |