IL SB0147 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on August 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-23 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0526
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on August 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-23 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0526
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Child Labor Law. Provides that, before a child may be issued a permit to work as a child performer, a trust account must be established providing, at a minimum, that: at least 15% (or a greater percentage as determined by rule) of the gross earnings of the child performer shall be deposited into the account; the funds in the account shall be available only to the child performer; the funds shall be held by a bank, corporate fiduciary, or trust company, as those terms are defined in the Corporate Fiduciary Act; and the funds in the account shall become available to the child performer upon the child performer attaining the age of 16 years. Provides that the new provisions do not apply to an employer of a child performer employed to perform services as an extra, services as a background performer, or services in a similar capacity. Provides that the Department of Labor shall adopt rules to implement the provisions.
Title
CHILD PERFORMERS-TRUST ACCOUNT
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 107 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 107 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-23 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0526 |
2019-08-23 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2020 |
2019-08-23 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2019-06-28 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Senate Concurs |
2019-05-31 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Senate Concurs 059-000-000 |
2019-05-31 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 059-000-000 |
2019-05-29 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Judiciary; 009-000-000 |
2019-05-29 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Judiciary; 009-000-000 |
2019-05-29 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Judiciary |
2019-05-29 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Judiciary |
2019-05-28 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2019-05-28 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Don Harmon |
2019-05-28 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2019-05-28 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Don Harmon |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 3 - May 29, 2019 |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 3 |
2019-05-27 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2019-05-27 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 107-010-000 |
2019-05-27 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-27 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted |
2019-05-24 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2019 |
2019-05-24 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommends Be Adopted Labor & Commerce Committee; 026-000-000 |
2019-05-23 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Rules Refers to Labor & Commerce Committee |
2019-05-22 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Bob Morgan |
2019-05-22 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-05-22 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2019-05-16 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-05-16 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2019-05-16 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-16 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-09 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-08 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Labor & Commerce Committee; 024-000-000 |
2019-05-08 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Labor & Commerce Committee; by Voice Vote |
2019-05-07 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Labor & Commerce Committee |
2019-05-06 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-05-06 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2019-04-30 | House | Assigned to Labor & Commerce Committee |
2019-04-11 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-11 | House | First Reading |
2019-04-11 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2019-04-11 | House | Arrived in House |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000 |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Harmon |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Judiciary; 008-000-000 |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Judiciary |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 12, 2019 |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 21, 2019 |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Do Pass Judiciary; 007-000-000 |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-01-29 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon |