IL SB0169 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on August 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-16 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0399
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on August 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-16 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0399
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Code of Civil Procedure. Provides that the failure to send a copy of the notice of foreclosure to the alderman or to file an affidavit as required results in a fine of $500 payable to the ward in which the property is located (instead of resulting in the dismissal without prejudice of the complaint or counterclaim on a motion of a party or the court). Deletes language regarding the requirements a party must comply with if the party refiles the complaint or counterclaim. Effective immediately.
Title
CIV PRO-NOTICE OF FORECLOSURE
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-24 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-16 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0399 |
2019-08-16 | Senate | Effective Date August 16, 2019 |
2019-08-16 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2019-06-21 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2019-05-24 | House | Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Jawaharial Williams |
2019-05-24 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jawaharial Williams |
2019-05-24 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Lamont J. Robinson, Jr. |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2019-05-24 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 108-000-002 |
2019-05-21 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-21 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-16 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-15 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Civil Committee; 010-001-000 |
2019-05-14 | House | Motion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed |
2019-05-14 | House | Motion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Judiciary - Civil Committee; Rep. Gregory Harris |
2019-05-14 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2019 |
2019-05-14 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2019-05-10 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-09 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2019-03-21 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-21 | House | First Reading |
2019-03-20 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner |
2019-03-20 | House | Arrived in House |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a) |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 054-000-000 |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 7, 2019 |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Financial Institutions; 009-000-000 |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Financial Institutions |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Financial Institutions |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. John G. Mulroe |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Financial Institutions |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Postponed - Financial Institutions |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. John G. Mulroe |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Assigned to Financial Institutions |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-01-30 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. John G. Mulroe |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
735 | 5 | 15-1503 | Amended Code | Citation Text |