IL SB0172 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 37-1)
Status: Passed on August 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0300
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 37-1)
Status: Passed on August 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0300
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the University of Illinois Trustees Act. Provides that in order to determine residency status of a potential or current student trustee, the student must provide evidence of the student's Illinois domicile for at least the previous 6 months and either (i) evidence of the student's current, valid Illinois driver's license or Illinois Identification Card or (ii) evidence of the student's valid Illinois voter registration (instead of having evidence of the student's Illinois domicile, Illinois driver's license, and Illinois voter registration positively demonstrate residency). Effective January 1, 2020.
Title
UNIV OF IL-STUDENT TRUSTEE
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-24 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 68 N: 44 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 47 N: 2 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 47 N: 2 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-09 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0300 |
2019-08-09 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2020 |
2019-08-09 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2019-06-21 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2019-05-24 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2019-05-24 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2019-05-24 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2019-05-24 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2019-05-24 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli |
2019-05-24 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech |
2019-05-24 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke |
2019-05-24 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz |
2019-05-24 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz |
2019-05-24 | House | Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Mike Murphy |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2019-05-24 | House | Third Reading - Standard Debate - Passed 068-044-000 |
2019-05-24 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Standard Debate |
2019-05-24 | House | Removed from Short Debate Status |
2019-05-21 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2019-05-21 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Luis Arroyo |
2019-05-21 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason |
2019-05-21 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Lamont J. Robinson, Jr. |
2019-05-21 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Murphy |
2019-05-16 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-16 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-16 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II |
2019-05-02 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray |
2019-05-02 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-01 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Higher Education Committee; 019-000-000 |
2019-04-30 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2019-04-11 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Bob Morgan |
2019-04-09 | House | Assigned to Higher Education Committee |
2019-04-05 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Edly-Allen |
2019-04-05 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2019-04-04 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2019-04-04 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Delia C. Ramirez |
2019-04-02 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner |
2019-04-02 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2019-03-29 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2019-03-29 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2019-03-29 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2019-03-29 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller |
2019-03-29 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Karina Villa |
2019-03-29 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Celina Villanueva |
2019-03-29 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez |
2019-03-21 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-21 | House | First Reading |
2019-03-20 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Aaron M. Ortiz |
2019-03-20 | House | Arrived in House |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 047-002-000 |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 14, 2019 |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 13, 2019 |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Do Pass Higher Education; 012-000-000 |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Martin A. Sandoval |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Assigned to Higher Education |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-01-30 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
110 | 310 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |