IL SB0174 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on August 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-02 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0190
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on August 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-02 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0190
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Reinserts the provisions of the introduced bill with the following changes. Makes the In-Office Membership Care Act apply only to dental care. In provisions concerning the effect of the Act, provides that the Act does not prohibit dental care providers who are not dental care providers offering in-office membership care agreements from entering into agreements with patients (rather than the Act does not prohibit dental care providers who are not dental care providers from entering into agreements with patients). Effective immediately.
Title
IN-OFFICE MEMBERSHIP CARE ACT
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-21 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-02 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0190 |
2019-08-02 | Senate | Effective Date August 2, 2019 |
2019-08-02 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2019-06-19 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2019-05-21 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2019-05-21 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 116-000-000 |
2019-05-16 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-16 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-02 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-04-30 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Insurance Committee; 017-000-000 |
2019-04-09 | House | Assigned to Insurance Committee |
2019-03-21 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-21 | House | First Reading |
2019-03-20 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2019-03-20 | House | Arrived in House |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 054-000-000 |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 12, 2019 |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Insurance; 016-000-000 |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Insurance |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Insurance |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. John G. Mulroe |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. John G. Mulroe |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Assigned to Insurance |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Dave Syverson |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-01-30 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. John G. Mulroe |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
215 | 5 | 352 | Amended Code | Citation Text |