IL SB0181 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-02 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0191
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-02 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0191
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Code of Civil Procedure. Provides that a judgment creditor is entitled to prosecute citations to discover assets (instead of supplementary proceedings) for the purposes of examining the judgment debtor or any other person to discover assets or income of the debtor not exempt from the enforcement of the judgment, a deduction order or garnishment, and of compelling the application of non-exempt assets or income discovered toward the payment of the amount due under the judgment. Deletes language providing that it is not a prerequisite to the commencement of a supplementary proceeding that a certified copy of the judgment has been returned wholly or partly unsatisfied. Provides that summons shall be returnable not less than 21 nor more than 40 days (rather than 30 days) after the date of issuance. Provides that summons shall be served with one copy (rather than 4 copies) of the interrogatories. Provides that a summons shall be served in the same manner as provided by the Illinois Supreme Court Rule for additional relief upon a party in default. Makes conforming changes. Effective immediately.
Title
CIV PRO-CITATIONS-SUMMONS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-21 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-02 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0191 |
2019-08-02 | Senate | Effective Date August 2, 2019 |
2019-08-02 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2019-06-19 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2019-05-21 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 115-000-000 |
2019-05-14 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-14 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-08 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-08 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Civil Committee; 014-000-000 |
2019-05-01 | House | Reported Back To Judiciary - Civil Committee; |
2019-05-01 | House | Recommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Judiciary - Civil Committee; 002-000-000 |
2019-04-24 | House | To Civil Procedure Subcommittee |
2019-04-09 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2019-03-07 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-07 | House | First Reading |
2019-03-07 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick |
2019-03-06 | House | Arrived in House |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 059-000-000 |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 5, 2019 |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 21, 2019 |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Do Pass Judiciary; 007-000-000 |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-01-30 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. John G. Mulroe |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
735 | 5 | 12-705 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
735 | 5 | 12-706 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
735 | 5 | 12-806 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
735 | 5 | 12-807 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
735 | 5 | 2-1402 | Amended Code | Citation Text |