IL SB0191 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-12 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0078
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Mental Health and Developmental Disabilities Administrative Act. Provides that a child shall continue to be eligible for an Individual Care Grant if the child is placed in the guardianship of the Department of Children and Family Services under the Juvenile Court Act of 1987 because the child requires care in a residential treatment facility and an application for the Family Support Program was pending with the Department Healthcare and Family Services or an active application was being reviewed by the Department when the guardianship order was entered. Provides that any minor who is placed in the guardianship of the Department of Children and Family Services under the Act while an application for the Family Support Program was pending with the Department of Healthcare and Family Services or an active application was being reviewed by the Department of Healthcare and Family Services shall continue to be considered eligible for services if all other eligibility criteria are met. Provides that the court shall conduct a hearing within 14 days upon notification to all parties that an application for the Family Support Program services has been approved and services are available. Makes other changes. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

JUV CT-FAMILY SUPPORT PROGRAM

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-12SenatePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0078
2019-07-12SenateEffective Date July 12, 2019
2019-07-12SenateGovernor Approved
2019-06-28SenateSent to the Governor
2019-05-31SenatePassed Both Houses
2019-05-31SenateSenate Concurs
2019-05-31SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 058-000-000
2019-05-28SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Human Services; 009-000-000
2019-05-22SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Human Services
2019-05-21SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
2019-05-21SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Laura Fine
2019-05-21SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 22, 2019
2019-05-21SenateSecretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1
2019-05-21HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2019-05-21HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 116-000-000
2019-05-14HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2019-05-14HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2019-05-10HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz
2019-05-08HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter
2019-05-08HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2019-05-07HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Adoption & Child Welfare Committee; 013-000-000
2019-05-07HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Adoption & Child Welfare Committee; by Voice Vote
2019-05-07HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Adoption & Child Welfare Committee
2019-05-02HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2019-05-02HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
2019-04-09HouseAssigned to Adoption & Child Welfare Committee
2019-03-06HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-03-06HouseFirst Reading
2019-03-06HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
2019-03-06HouseArrived in House
2019-03-06SenateThird Reading - Passed; 058-000-000
2019-03-05SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 6, 2019
2019-03-05SenateSecond Reading
2019-03-05SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading
2019-03-05SenateDo Pass Human Services; 010-000-000
2019-02-06SenateAssigned to Human Services
2019-01-30SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-01-30SenateFirst Reading
2019-01-30SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Laura Fine

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2017057.1Amended CodeCitation Text
7054055-711New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback