IL SB0192 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-22 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Juvenile Court Act of 1987. Provides that if the parent, guardian, legal custodian, responsible relative, minor age 8 or over, or counsel of the minor did not have actual notice of and was not present at the shelter care hearing, he or she may file a motion with an affidavit (rather than affidavit) setting forth these facts, and the court shall set the matter for rehearing not later than 48 hours, excluding Sundays and legal holidays, after the filing of the motion. Makes conforming changes. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

JUV CT-TEMP CUSTODY

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-22SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2019-03-20SenatePostponed - Judiciary
2019-03-12SenatePostponed - Judiciary
2019-03-05SenatePostponed - Judiciary
2019-02-20SenatePostponed - Judiciary
2019-02-19SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison
2019-02-06SenateAssigned to Judiciary
2019-01-30SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-01-30SenateFirst Reading
2019-01-30SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Laura Fine

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
7054052-10Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback