IL SB0201 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Wildlife Code. Provides that it shall be lawful for any person who holds the licenses, permits, and stamps required for the taking of migratory waterfowl to use steel and other non-toxic shotshells as approved by the United States Fish and Wildlife Service when taking waterfowl at any location in the State where the hunting of migratory waterfowl is authorized. Provides that it is unlawful to use any shotgun larger than 10 gauge or smaller than a .410 bore to take species protected by this Act; however, nothing shall prohibit the use of a shotgun, not larger than 10 gauge nor smaller than a 20 gauge, with a rifled barrel. Provides that it shall be unlawful to use lead shotshells to take wildlife on Department of Natural Resources properties on or after January 1, 2022. Makes other changes.
Title
WILDLIFE-LEAD AMMUNITION
Sponsors
Sen. Don Harmon [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2020-12-01 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Don Harmon |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Postponed - Agriculture |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Agriculture; 006-003-000 |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Agriculture |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Agriculture |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Postponed - Agriculture |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Postponed - Agriculture |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Postponed - Agriculture |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Assigned to Agriculture |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-01-30 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |